U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Tucker v. Cheshire County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Fee Paid]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.