U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittmann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Bail]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 21, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 01, 2024: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: [Motion Hearing Notice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • December 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • December 15, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 29, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.