U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00532
  • Case Name: Abrams v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 29, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 29, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Judge - Trial]
  • December 23, 2022: [Transport Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transport Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 29, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • November 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.