U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00535
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. Google, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stay]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 30, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.