U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Armendariz et al v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 01, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Case Assigned]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.