U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00540
  • Case Name: Avila Gonzalez v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 20, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Addendum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 10, 2023: [Fee Paid]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice Regarding Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 02, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 02, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.