U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00539
  • Case Name: Thomas v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Terminated Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 02, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.