U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00544
  • Case Name: Arcentales Mero v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice Regarding Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 12, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • December 12, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • December 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.