U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00546
  • Case Name: Sampeur v. Rannie Webster Foundation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.