U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00545
  • Case Name: Macias-Lucas v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.