U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00548
  • Case Name: Private Jet Services Group, LLC v. Twitter, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 19, 2023: [Recusal Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 18, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 10, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice Regarding Service]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 12, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.