U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Thomas v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • January 24, 2023: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • January 17, 2023: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Clerk Service]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Directing Service]
  • January 05, 2023: [Expedite]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • December 22, 2022: [Addendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • December 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 13, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.