U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00551
  • Case Name: Gross v. McCarthy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • December 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.