U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00553
  • Case Name: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Rust-Oleum Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 16, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.