U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00557
  • Case Name: Carpentier Construction, LLC v. Allyn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Third Party Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 13, 2023: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • January 09, 2023: [Attachment Petition - With Notice]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 06, 2023: [Counterclaim]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.