U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00560
  • Case Name: Gray v. Gray
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Remand]
  • January 23, 2023: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • January 13, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2023: [Counterclaim]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2023: [Objection to Magistrate Judges Decision Rule 72a]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response - to terminated motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 04, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Terminated Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [State Court Record]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 28, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 22, 2022: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.