U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00564
  • Case Name: Williams v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 19, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2023: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 10, 2023: [Fee Paid]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Management Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Hearing Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - Not on Motion]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 30, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • December 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 28, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.