U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00571
  • Case Name: Rogers v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 19, 2023: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Clerk Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Directing Service]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 30, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • December 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.