U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00573
  • Case Name: Banfield Realty LLC v. Copeland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 06, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Addendum]
  • September 30, 2024: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • September 30, 2024: [Extend Time]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 05, 2023: [Case Assigned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 30, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.