U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00572
  • Case Name: MRFRANCHISE, INC. et al v. Stratford Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 14, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • May 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 13, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • May 13, 2025: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Deposition Designation]
  • May 12, 2025: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • May 08, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Continue Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 04, 2023: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Case Assigned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 30, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.