U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00570
  • Case Name: Elias et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Local Counsel Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 03, 2023: [Case Assigned]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Bankruptcy Reference - Motion to Withdraw]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.