U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00002
  • Case Name: McNeil v. Health Care and Rehabilitation Services of Southeastern Vermont, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 26, 2025: [New Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • February 20, 2025: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • February 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 10, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 04, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 02, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 02, 2025: [Objection not to motion]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 23, 2025: [Excuse]
  • January 21, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 21, 2025: [In Limine]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 12, 2023: [State Court Record]
  • January 12, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Opening Error]
  • January 06, 2023: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Assigned]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.