U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Boatman v. Summa Humma Enterprises, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Assent to Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2023: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [AO 121 Copyright]
  • January 06, 2023: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Assigned]
  • January 05, 2023: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.