U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00566
  • Case Name: Maragh v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Reference-Consent/Reassignment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 13, 2023: [AG Service - Complaint]
  • January 13, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 10, 2023: [Fee Paid]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.