U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00235
  • Case Name: CSMI LLC v. Intelagard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • September 27, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • September 26, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.