U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Czekalski v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Response - to terminated motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.