U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00238
  • Case Name: San Antonio v. Win-Waste Innovations of Northern New England
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 26, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.