U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00268
  • Case Name: Katsigiannis v. M.H. Parsons & Sons Lumbar Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 30, 2024: [State Court Record]
  • September 30, 2024: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • September 26, 2024: [Extend Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.