U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Scaer et al v. Nashua, NH, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appellate Case Number]
  • April 11, 2025: [Clerks Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 11, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 10, 2024: [Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection]
  • October 10, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.