U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Brzezinski v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [ERISA Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [ERISA List of Disputed Facts]
  • March 14, 2025: [ERISA Joint Statement of Material Facts]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Administrative Record-ERISA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.