U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00560
  • Case Name: Barkley v. Avanzino et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Mediation Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Leave to File]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 25, 2024: [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.