U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00156
  • Case Name: USA v. Psomas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment - Default]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Strike]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.