U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00330
  • Case Name: RegDOX Solutions, Inc. v. IQM Research Institute
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Trial Notice]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Report]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.