U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00291
  • Case Name: New Hampshire Youth Movement v. Scanlan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • May 05, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • April 05, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 05, 2025: [Exceed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 26, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - Other]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.