U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Varga v. White et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Nonconforming Document Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 27, 2024: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Consolidation Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Withdraw]
  • October 02, 2024: [Default]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • September 27, 2024: [Addendum]
  • September 27, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [Extend Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.