U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00073
  • Case Name: League of Women Voters of New Hampshire et al v. Kramer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Transcript]
  • September 28, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amicus Curiae Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.