U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00290
  • Case Name: Exothermics, Inc. v. Ernst & Young U.S. LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.