U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Powers v. Durham, NH, Town of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exceed]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exceed]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Trial Notice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.