U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Kratzenberg v. NH Supreme Court, Chief Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Subpoena]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Default]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.