U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Wells v. Pierce et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Surreply to Reply]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.