U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00312
  • Case Name: Coalition for Open Democracy et al v. Formella et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 10, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 06, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • March 05, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • February 02, 2025: [Intervene]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Assigned]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 03, 2024: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.