U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Gigliotti v. Northern NH Correctional Facility et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • May 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - Not on Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • October 09, 2024: [Transport Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.