U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Fellers et al v. SAU 67, Superintendent et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Appellate Case Number]
  • May 05, 2025: [Clerks Certificate]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • November 09, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2024: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2024: [Notice - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 17, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Addendum]
  • October 04, 2024: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Return of Service Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 30, 2024: [Case Assigned]
  • September 30, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.