U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Heidenreich v. Apollo Retail Specialists, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Conference Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 09, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Surreply to Reply]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.