U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Ioannidis et al v. Polaris Industries Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 09, 2025: [Assent to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.