U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Sieverding v. US Department of Justice
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2025: [Addendum]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Addendum]
  • November 11, 2024: [Strike]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Amend]
  • October 25, 2024: [Addendum]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.