U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00403
  • Case Name: Gagne v. Barrington Police Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • May 02, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Default]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [USM Return]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to]
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Clerk Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Directing Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Trial Notice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • October 01, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.