U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Woodham v. Woodham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Appellate Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerks Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2024: [Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.