U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: B. D., by their next friend, Christine Wellington v. Governor, NH, State of, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Compel]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Amend]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.