U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00336
  • Case Name: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Settlement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Surreply to Reply]
  • October 10, 2024: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Leave to File]
  • October 02, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.